Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR5 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Ogden S.J.R. No. 5
 (In the Senate - Filed April 18, 2011; April 18, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 26, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0; April 26, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 5 By:  Ogden


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to increasing the
 market value of the permanent school fund for the purpose of
 allowing increased distributions from the available school fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 5, Article VII, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The permanent school fund consists of all land
 appropriated for public schools by this constitution or the other
 laws of this state, other properties belonging to the permanent
 school fund, and all revenue derived from the land or other
 properties.  The available school fund consists of the
 distributions made to it from the total return on all investment
 assets of the permanent school fund, the taxes authorized by this
 constitution or general law to be part of the available school fund,
 and appropriations made to the available school fund by the
 legislature.  The total amount distributed from the permanent
 school fund to the available school fund:
 (1)  in each year of a state fiscal biennium must be an
 amount that is not more than six percent of the average of the
 market value of the permanent school fund, excluding real property
 belonging to the fund that is managed, sold, or acquired under
 Section 4 of this article, but including discretionary real assets
 investments and cash in the state treasury derived from property
 belonging to the fund, on the last day of each of the 16 state fiscal
 quarters preceding the regular session of the legislature that
 begins before that state fiscal biennium, in accordance with the
 rate adopted by:
 (A)  a vote of two-thirds of the total membership
 of the State Board of Education, taken before the regular session of
 the legislature convenes; or
 (B)  the legislature by general law or
 appropriation, if the State Board of Education does not adopt a rate
 as provided by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision; and
 (2)  over the 10-year period consisting of the current
 state fiscal year and the nine preceding state fiscal years may not
 exceed the total return on all investment assets of the permanent
 school fund over the same 10-year period.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by S.J.R. No. 5, 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, providing for an increase in
 the market value of the permanent school fund for the purpose of
 allowing increased distributions from the available school fund.
 (b)  The change to Section 5(a), Article VII, of this
 constitution made by the amendment applies to a distribution from
 the permanent school fund to the available school fund made on or
 after September 1, 2011.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires December 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment providing for an
 increase in the market value of the permanent school fund for the
 purpose of allowing increased distributions from the available
 school fund."
 * * * * *