Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR9 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.J.R. No. 9
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; February 2, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the governor to
 grant a pardon to a person who successfully completes a term of
 deferred adjudication community supervision.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 11, Article IV, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  In all criminal cases, except treason and impeachment,
 the Governor shall have power, after conviction or successful
 completion of a term of deferred adjudication community
 supervision, on the written signed recommendation and advice of the
 Board of Pardons and Paroles, or a majority thereof, to grant
 reprieves and commutations of punishment and pardons; and under
 such rules as the Legislature may prescribe, and upon the written
 recommendation and advice of a majority of the Board of Pardons and
 Paroles, he shall have the power to remit fines and forfeitures.
 The Governor shall have the power to grant one reprieve in any
 capital case for a period not to exceed thirty (30) days; and he
 shall have power to revoke conditional pardons. With the advice and
 consent of the Legislature, he may grant reprieves, commutations of
 punishment and pardons in cases of treason.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 governor to grant a pardon to a person who successfully completes a
 term of deferred adjudication community supervision."
 * * * * *