Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR362

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Congratulating Rosemary Deen on her receipt of a 2009 Spirit Award from the San Antonio Metropolitan Chapter of Top Ladies of Distinction.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR363

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Passed
3/15/11  
In memory of Dorothy Dee Nicholson of San Antonio.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR364

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Congratulating Dianne McNeil-Henderson on her retirement from the San Antonio Independent School District.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR365

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Recognizing April 12, 2011, as Panola County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR366

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Passed
3/15/11  
Honoring Sam Gavin Gibbs of Midland for his induction into the Petroleum Hall of Fame.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR367

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Congratulating Garrett Matthew Betros of Cameron on achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR368

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
2/23/11  
Enrolled
2/23/11  
Passed
2/23/11  
Recognizing February 22, 2011, as Rolling Plains Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR369

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Encouraging greater public awareness of the risks of pertussis and of the importance of adolescents and adults receiving the Tdap vaccine.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR37

Introduced
12/21/10  
Refer
2/14/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Passed
3/4/11  
Commemorating the 43rd anniversary of the 1969 Crystal City student walkout.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR370

Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Passed
3/15/11  
Congratulating the citizens of Burleson on their city's recognition as one of the 100 Best Communities for Young People.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR371

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
In memory of Kathleen Jeanne Jones Gilles of Arlington.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR372

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Enrolled
2/16/11  
Enrolled
2/16/11  
Passed
2/16/11  
Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Kidney Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR373

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Passed
2/15/11  
Honoring students from Weslaco High School for participating in Texas SkillsUSA Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR374

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Enrolled
2/18/11  
Enrolled
2/18/11  
Passed
2/18/11  
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Stephen F. Austin State University Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR375

Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/24/11  
Recognizing March 22, 2011, as Parker County Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records