Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR376

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Passed
3/4/11  
Honoring Leadership Gillespie County for its promotion of civic leadership and volunteerism.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR377

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Passed
3/4/11  
Recognizing the 45th annual Texas Legislative Conference in New Braunfels on March 24 and 25, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR378

Honoring Youth Leadership New Braunfels for its promotion of civic leadership and volunteerism.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR379

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Passed
3/4/11  
Honoring Leadership Bulverde--Spring Branch for its promotion of civic leadership and volunteerism.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR38

Introduced
12/21/10  
Introduced
12/21/10  
Refer
2/14/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Enrolled
3/4/11  
Passed
3/4/11  
In memory of Tejano Legend Laura Canales of Kingsville on April 16, 2011, the sixth anniversary of her death.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR380

Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
4/5/11  
Recognizing April 9, 2011, as Welcome Home South Texas Vietnam Veterans Day.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR381

Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Honoring Emilio De Los Santos III on being chosen as the recipient of the 2010 Dan Garcia Memorial Achievement Award presented by the Veterans County Service Officers Association of Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR382

Introduced
2/10/11  
Introduced
2/10/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Texas Association of Black Personnel in Higher Education Day.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR383

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Enrolled
2/17/11  
Enrolled
2/17/11  
Passed
2/17/11  
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Susan G.Komen for the Cure Advocacy Day.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR384

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Passed
2/15/11  
Recognizing Misa Watanabe of Japan as an honorary Texan.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR385

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/14/11  
Enrolled
3/14/11  
Passed
3/14/11  
Recognizing March 1, 2011, as Coastal Bend Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR386

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
In memory of James Edward Starrett of Arlington.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR387

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
In memory of Pearl Lilley Fincher of Spring.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR388

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Enrolled
3/15/11  
Passed
3/15/11  
In memory of Ann Olson Ivey of Arlington.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR389

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Refer
2/18/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
In memory of Michael Lee Gore of Arlington.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records