Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR592

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Recognizing February 24, 2011, as Responsible Pet Owners Alliance Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR593

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Congratulating the football team from Lake Travis High School in Austin on winning the UIL Class 4A Division 1 state championship for 2010.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR594

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Congratulating the Lake Travis High School volleyball team on winning the UIL 4A state championship for 2010.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR595

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Rice University Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR596

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Congratulating Alda T. Benavides on being named the Distinguished Bilingual Educator of the Year by the Rio Grande Valley-Texas Association for Bilingual Education.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR597

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Honoring Eudean and Patricia Howard of Brownwood on their 50th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR598

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Passed
3/7/11  
Congratulating Leta Andrews of Granbury High School on becoming the most victorious coach in American high school basketball history.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR599

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Recognizing March 23, 2011, as McMullen County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR60

Introduced
1/5/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Enrolled
3/2/11  
In memory of U.S. Marine Corporal Jacob Carl Leicht of Kerrville.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR600

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Passed
3/7/11  
Recognizing March 2, 2011, as Texas Flag Day.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR601

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Commemorating Mother's Day 2011 and honoring all mothers.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR602

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Commemorating Father's Day 2011 and honoring all fathers.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR603

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
5/27/11  
Enrolled
5/27/11  
Passed
5/27/11  
Commemorating Flag Day on June 14, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR604

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Recognizing March 8, 2011, as The University of Texas at San Antonio Day at the State Capitol and commending the UTSA Alumni Association for its support.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR605

Introduced
2/24/11  
Introduced
2/24/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Enrolled
4/5/11  
Enrolled
4/5/11  
Passed
4/5/11  
Honoring Andrew Dean Livingston on his 65th birthday.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records