Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR633

Introduced
2/25/11  
Introduced
2/25/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Commending the Images for Conservation Fund on the occasion of the Pro-Tour of Nature Photography exhibit at the State Capitol from February 28 to March 4, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR634

Introduced
2/25/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Honoring state district court judge Susan Criss of Galveston on the occasion of her 50th birthday.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR635

Introduced
2/25/11  
Introduced
2/25/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Congratulating NuStar Energy on earning The Spirit of Caring Award from United Way Galveston County Mainland.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR636

Introduced
2/25/11  
Enrolled
3/14/11  
Recognizing March 1, 2011, as Austin County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR637

Introduced
2/25/11  
Introduced
2/25/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Recognizing February 28, 2011, as Rockwall County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR638

Introduced
2/25/11  
Introduced
2/25/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
In memory of Carl Lester Merritt of Mineola.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR639

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Passed
3/7/11  
Recognizing March 2, 2011, as Texas Transit Association Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR64

Introduced
1/5/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
In memory of longtime Kerrville resident Linda Lashley Trisch.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR640

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Honoring the Paschal High School Choir of the Fort Worth Independent School District on the occasion of its performance at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR641

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Enrolled
3/17/11  
Passed
3/17/11  
Recognizing March 14 through 20, 2011, as Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week in Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR642

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Congratulating Raylan and Dinah Weable of Waxahachie on their 50th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR643

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Honoring the Del Rio Chamber of Commerce on the 75th anniversary of its founding.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR644

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Passed
3/7/11  
Recognizing March 1, 2011, as City of Dallas Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR645

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Enrolled
3/16/11  
Passed
3/16/11  
Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Tarrant County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR646

Introduced
2/28/11  
Introduced
2/28/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Enrolled
3/3/11  
Passed
3/3/11  
Honoring the Shriners of North America and International House of Pancakes for their charitable support of children on National Pancake Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records