Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR54

Refer
5/9/11  
Refer
5/9/11  
Enrolled
5/19/11  
Enrolled
5/19/11  
Passed
6/17/11  
In memory of Gregory Mack Simmons.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR55

Refer
5/19/11  
Enrolled
5/20/11  
In memory of the lives of John Clinton Formby and Margaret Clark Formby.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR56

Refer
5/19/11  
Enrolled
5/26/11  
Honoring John Cowan on the occasion of his retirement from the Texas Association of Dairymen.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR57

Enrolled
5/21/11  
Recalling H.B. No. 2277 from the house for further consideration.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR58

Enrolled
5/25/11  
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 768.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR59

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1082.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR6

Introduced
1/12/11  
Introduced
1/12/11  
Enrolled
1/19/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 13, 2011, and ending on Tuesday, January 18, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR60

Enrolled
5/30/11  
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1420.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR7

Introduced
1/19/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 19, 2011, and ending on Monday, January 24, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR8

Introduced
1/26/11  
Introduced
1/26/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 26, 2011, and ending on Monday, January 31, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR9

Introduced
1/27/11  
Introduced
1/27/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Urging the United States Congress to amend the list of allowable foods under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program to eliminate sweetened drinks and snack foods of minimal nutritional value.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR1

Filed
 
Out of Senate Committee
2/17/11  
Introduced
12/2/10  
Voted on by Senate
2/23/11  
Voted on by House
 
Sent toSOS
 
Proposed Const. Amend.
 
Urging the Congress of the United States to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States and, in the event that Congress does not submit such an amendment on or before December 31, 2011, applying to Congress to call a convention for the specific and exclusive purpose of proposing an amendment to that constitution to provide, in the absence of a national emergency and on a two-thirds vote of Congress, for a federal balanced budget and requesting that the legislatures of each of the several states that compose the United States apply to Congress to call a convention to propose such an amendment.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR10

Voted on by Senate
 
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Sent toSOS
 
Proposed Const. Amend.
 
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to require a balanced federal budget.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR11

Voted on by Senate
 
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Sent toSOS
 
Proposed Const. Amend.
 
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to limit the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to 105 percent or less of the appraised value of the property for the preceding tax year and to permit the voters of a county to establish a higher limitation not to exceed 110 percent on the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead in the county.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR12

Filed
 
Out of Senate Committee
4/5/11  
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Sent toSOS
 
Proposed Const. Amend.
 
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain tax bills to be approved by two-thirds of all the members elected to each house of the legislature.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records