Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR16

Introduced
1/13/11  
Introduced
1/13/11  
Enrolled
1/13/11  
Enrolled
1/13/11  
Passed
1/13/11  
Recognizing the Harmony School of Nature and Athletics in Dallas on the occasion of its official opening and science fair.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR160

Introduced
2/1/11  
Introduced
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Passed
2/1/11  
Recognizing February 1, 2011, as Texas Organization of Residential Care Homes Day in Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR161

Introduced
2/1/11  
Introduced
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Enrolled
2/1/11  
Passed
2/1/11  
In memory of Foy Wallace Watson, Jr., of Austin.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR162

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Passed
2/9/11  
Recognizing February 9, 2011, as Harlingen Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR163

Introduced
1/31/11  
Enrolled
1/31/11  
Passed
1/31/11  
Celebrating East Texas Coalition Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR164

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Commending the Texas 4-H and Youth Development Program on its many contributions to the young people of Texas.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR165

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Passed
2/2/11  
In memory of Nicolas O. Estrada of San Antonio.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR166

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Celebrating February 23, 2011, as Hill County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR167

Introduced
2/2/11  
Introduced
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Enrolled
2/2/11  
Passed
2/2/11  
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Dyslexia Awareness Day at the Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR168

Introduced
2/14/11  
Introduced
2/14/11  
Enrolled
2/14/11  
Enrolled
2/14/11  
Passed
2/14/11  
Commending the students, faculty, and staff of Saint Mary's University.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR169

Introduced
2/15/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Passed
2/15/11  
Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Dallas Assembly Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR17

Introduced
2/15/11  
Introduced
2/15/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Enrolled
2/15/11  
Passed
2/15/11  
Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Viva San Antonio Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR170

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing February 28, 2011, as Hunt County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR171

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing February 28, 2011, as Rockwall County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR172

Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Celebrating March 23, 2011, as Sunnyvale Day at the Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records