Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR173

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Celebrating March 7, 2011, as Kaufman County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR174

Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing February 15, 2011, as Van Zandt County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR175

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Celebrating March 8, 2011, as Fannin County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR176

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing February 22, 2011, as Rains County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR177

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
In memory of William Barton Harris.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR178

Introduced
2/8/11  
Enrolled
2/8/11  
Celebrating February 8, 2011, as KIPP Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR179

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing Shannon Schambeau Patterson of McKinney for being chosen Mrs. Texas America 2010.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR18

Introduced
1/18/11  
Introduced
1/18/11  
Enrolled
1/18/11  
Enrolled
1/18/11  
Passed
1/18/11  
Congratulating Cornelius Elementary School in Houston for its selection as a 2010 Blue Ribbon School.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR180

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing Ryan Place Addition of Fort Worth on the occasion of the neighborhood's 100th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR181

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Celebrating February 9, 2011, as Waco Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR182

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing Hanh Tran of Houston on the occasion of her current art installation.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR183

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/9/11  
Passed
2/9/11  
Recognizing Leon Schmidt on the occasion of his 95th birthday.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR184

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
In memory of Richard Reese Wenneker.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR185

Introduced
2/7/11  
Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Passed
2/7/11  
Recognizing the members and clergy of the African Methodist Episcopal Church for their contributions to our society.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR186

Introduced
2/7/11  
Enrolled
2/7/11  
Recognizing Bobbie Moore for her 28 years of service to Trinity Valley Church of God in Christ and the West Dallas community.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records