Texas 2011 82nd 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB37 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82nd LEGISLATURE 1st CALLED SESSION - 2011            June 8, 2011      TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB37 by Guillen (Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive access point for long-term services and supports provided to older persons and persons with physical disabilities.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in conjunction with the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), to establish a comprehensive pilot project to establish a single point of entry system for certain long-term care services.  HHSC would be required to establish a tentative eligibility determination for these services.  The bill would direct the commission to establish the pilot in an office that has colocated long-term services and supports staff members. The bill would also require that HHSC submit a report no later than January 31, 2013 concerning the project to the presiding officers of the standing committee of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over health and human services.  The pilot project would expire on September 1, 2015. The bill would require that the pilot site be in operation no later than December 31, 2011. The bill would allow for a delay in implementation if the agency determines that it requires a waiver or authority from a federal agency to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; if not, it would take effect on the 91st day after the last day of the legislative session. For purposes of this analysis, it is assumed any costs associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MB, ES, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82nd LEGISLATURE 1st CALLED SESSION - 2011
June 8, 2011





  TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB37 by Guillen (Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive access point for long-term services and supports provided to older persons and persons with physical disabilities.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB37 by Guillen (Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive access point for long-term services and supports provided to older persons and persons with physical disabilities.), As Introduced

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB37 by Guillen (Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive access point for long-term services and supports provided to older persons and persons with physical disabilities.), As Introduced

HB37 by Guillen (Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive access point for long-term services and supports provided to older persons and persons with physical disabilities.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in conjunction with the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), to establish a comprehensive pilot project to establish a single point of entry system for certain long-term care services.  HHSC would be required to establish a tentative eligibility determination for these services.  The bill would direct the commission to establish the pilot in an office that has colocated long-term services and supports staff members. The bill would also require that HHSC submit a report no later than January 31, 2013 concerning the project to the presiding officers of the standing committee of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over health and human services.  The pilot project would expire on September 1, 2015. The bill would require that the pilot site be in operation no later than December 31, 2011. The bill would allow for a delay in implementation if the agency determines that it requires a waiver or authority from a federal agency to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; if not, it would take effect on the 91st day after the last day of the legislative session. For purposes of this analysis, it is assumed any costs associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

The bill would amend Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, to require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in conjunction with the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), to establish a comprehensive pilot project to establish a single point of entry system for certain long-term care services.  HHSC would be required to establish a tentative eligibility determination for these services.  The bill would direct the commission to establish the pilot in an office that has colocated long-term services and supports staff members. The bill would also require that HHSC submit a report no later than January 31, 2013 concerning the project to the presiding officers of the standing committee of the senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over health and human services.  The pilot project would expire on September 1, 2015. The bill would require that the pilot site be in operation no later than December 31, 2011. The bill would allow for a delay in implementation if the agency determines that it requires a waiver or authority from a federal agency to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote in each house; if not, it would take effect on the 91st day after the last day of the legislative session.

For purposes of this analysis, it is assumed any costs associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MB, ES, VJC

 JOB, CL, MB, ES, VJC