Texas 2011 82nd 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB37 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82S10233 MXM-D
 By: Ellis, Davis, Lucio S.B. No. 37


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the elimination of the tax exemption or reduction for
 certain high-cost gas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.057(f), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (f)  To qualify for the exemption or tax reduction provided
 by this section, the person responsible for paying the tax must
 apply to the comptroller. Notwithstanding any other provision of
 this section, the application must be filed with the comptroller
 before October 1, 2011. The application must contain the
 certification of the commission that the well produces high-cost
 gas and, if the application is for a well spudded or completed after
 September 1, 1995, must contain a report of drilling and completion
 costs incurred for each well on a form and in the detail as
 determined by the comptroller. Drilling and completion costs for a
 recompletion shall only include current and contemporaneous costs
 associated with the recompletion. Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this section, to obtain the maximum tax exemption or
 tax deduction, an application to the comptroller for certification
 according to Subsection (a)(2)(A) must be filed with the
 comptroller before October 1, 2011, and at the later of the 180th
 day after the date of first production or the 45th day after the
 date of approval by the commission. If the application is not filed
 by the applicable deadline to obtain the maximum tax exemption or
 tax deduction but is filed before October 1, 2011, the tax exemption
 or tax deduction is reduced by 10 percent for the period beginning
 on the 180th day after the first day of production and ending on the
 date on which the application is filed with the comptroller. An
 application to the comptroller for certification according to
 Subsection (a)(2)(B) may not be filed before January 1, 1990, or
 after December 31, 1998. The comptroller shall approve the
 application of a person who demonstrates that the gas is eligible
 for the exemption or tax reduction. The comptroller may require a
 person applying for the exemption or tax reduction to provide any
 relevant information in the person's monthly report that the
 comptroller considers necessary to administer this section. The
 commission shall notify the comptroller in writing immediately if
 it determines that an oil or gas well previously certified as
 producing high-cost gas does not produce high-cost gas or if it
 takes any action or discovers any information that affects the
 eligibility of gas for an exemption or tax reduction under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall deposit
 to the credit of the foundation school fund any revenue received
 during the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2011, that
 is generated by the change made by this Act to Section 201.057, Tax
 Code.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act.  That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.