Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1023 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 12, 2013      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1023 by Burkett (Relating to the creation of a task force to investigate and make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), or the delegated health and human services agency, to establish a task force by October 1, 2013, to investigate the types of providers and licensed professionals for which shortages exist, the locations and degrees of shortages, the effect of the shortages on the ability of persons with mental illness to receive services, and the economic and societal effect of the shortages.   The bill would require HHSC to submit a report by December 1, 2014, to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and the appropriate legislative committees with the results of the task force's investigations and recommendations.   The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received; otherwise, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2013.  Based on the analysis provided by HHSC and the Department of State Health Services, it is assumed that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, CH, NB    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 12, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1023 by Burkett (Relating to the creation of a task force to investigate and make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1023 by Burkett (Relating to the creation of a task force to investigate and make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1023 by Burkett (Relating to the creation of a task force to investigate and make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages.), As Engrossed

HB1023 by Burkett (Relating to the creation of a task force to investigate and make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), or the delegated health and human services agency, to establish a task force by October 1, 2013, to investigate the types of providers and licensed professionals for which shortages exist, the locations and degrees of shortages, the effect of the shortages on the ability of persons with mental illness to receive services, and the economic and societal effect of the shortages.   The bill would require HHSC to submit a report by December 1, 2014, to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and the appropriate legislative committees with the results of the task force's investigations and recommendations.   The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received; otherwise, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2013.  Based on the analysis provided by HHSC and the Department of State Health Services, it is assumed that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources.

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), or the delegated health and human services agency, to establish a task force by October 1, 2013, to investigate the types of providers and licensed professionals for which shortages exist, the locations and degrees of shortages, the effect of the shortages on the ability of persons with mental illness to receive services, and the economic and societal effect of the shortages.  

The bill would require HHSC to submit a report by December 1, 2014, to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house, and the appropriate legislative committees with the results of the task force's investigations and recommendations.  

The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received; otherwise, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2013. 

Based on the analysis provided by HHSC and the Department of State Health Services, it is assumed that the provisions of the bill can be implemented within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, CH, NB

 UP, CL, CH, NB