H.B. No. 1023 AN ACT relating to recommendations by the Health and Human Services Commission or a designated health and human services agency regarding mental health workforce shortages. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. RECOMMENDATIONS ON MENTAL HEALTH WORKFORCE SHORTAGE. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission, or a health and human services agency designated by the commission, shall use existing information and data available through the commission, the Department of State Health Services, the statewide health coordinating council, and nongovernmental entities with expertise in mental health workforce issues to make recommendations regarding mental health workforce shortages in this state. (b) Not later than September 1, 2014, the Health and Human Services Commission, or the health and human services agency designated by the commission, shall submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the appropriate standing committees of the legislature that includes: (1) specific recommendations to alleviate mental health workforce shortages in this state; (2) an assessment of the feasibility of implementing each recommendation; (3) the estimated costs and benefits of each recommendation; and (4) the specific legislative action, if any, needed to implement each recommendation. SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1023 was passed by the House on April 25, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1023 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 2, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1023 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor