H.B. No. 1122 AN ACT relating to a pilot program for a three-year high school diploma plan and cost-neutral expansion of full-day prekindergarten programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 28.0255 to read as follows: Sec. 28.0255. PILOT PROGRAM: THREE-YEAR HIGH SCHOOL DIPLOMA PLAN. (a) In this section, "certificate program," "public junior college," "public state college," and "public technical institute" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003. (b) This section applies only to a school district: (1) with an enrollment of more than 150,000 students; and (2) located primarily in a county that has a population of 2.2 million or more and that is adjacent to a county with a population of more than 600,000. (c) A school district to which this section applies may develop and implement a pilot program for students who wish to obtain a high school diploma after completion of three years of secondary school attendance as an alternative to the traditional four-year period of attendance. The program must include partnerships between the school district and public junior colleges, public technical institutes, public state colleges, and any other public postsecondary institutions in this state offering academic or technical education or vocational training under a certificate program or an associate degree program to facilitate the prompt enrollment of students in those institutions after high school graduation under the program. (d) Participation by a student in the program must be voluntary, with approval of the student's parent. A student who agrees to participate in the program may, on request, discontinue participation and resume taking courses under a high school program based on a traditional four-year period of attendance. (e) Notwithstanding Section 28.025, the school district shall specify the curriculum requirements for receiving a high school diploma under the program. The curriculum requirements must ensure that a student who graduates under the program possesses sufficient knowledge and skills in English language arts and mathematics to be capable of performing successfully in public junior college-level courses. (f) The school district shall submit to the commissioner for approval the district's proposal regarding the scope of the program and the program curriculum requirements. The school district shall also submit the proposed curriculum requirements to the State Board of Education for comment. The district may not implement the program before obtaining the commissioner's approval of the scope of the program and the program curriculum requirements. (g) A student is entitled to a high school diploma if the student: (1) successfully complies with the curriculum requirements specified under Subsection (e); and (2) performs satisfactorily, as determined by the commissioner under Subsection (h), on end-of-course assessment instruments listed under Section 39.023(c) for courses in which the student was enrolled. (h) For purposes of Subsection (g)(2), the commissioner shall determine the level of satisfactory performance on applicable end-of-course assessment instruments administered to a student. (i) The school district shall report the academic achievement record of students who have completed the program on a transcript that clearly identifies the program and distinguishes the program from the other high school programs based on a traditional four-year period of attendance. (j) A student who has received a diploma under the program is exempt from the compulsory school attendance requirements under Section 25.085. (k) To the extent this section conflicts with any other provision of this code or rule adopted under this code, this section prevails. (l) This section expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 42, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 42.2526 to read as follows: Sec. 42.2526. ADJUSTMENT FOR DISTRICT OPERATING PILOT PROGRAM. (a) This section applies only to a school district operating a pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255. (b) Beginning with the first school year that follows the first school year in which students receive high school diplomas under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 and continuing for every subsequent school year that the district operates the pilot program, the commissioner shall provide funding for the district's prekindergarten program under Section 29.153 on a full-day basis for a number of prekindergarten students equal to twice the number of students who received a high school diploma under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 during the preceding school year. (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1122 was passed by the House on May 8, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 18, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1122 on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 12, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1122 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor