Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1128 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Herrero, Cortez, Alvarado H.B. No. 1128
 (Senate Sponsor - Garcia)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1128 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to posting suggestions and ideas on cost-efficiency on
 certain state agency websites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.1264 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.1264. POSTING OF COST-EFFICIENCY SUGGESTIONS AND
 IDEAS ON STATE AGENCY WEBSITE.  (a)  In this section, "state
 agency" does not include an institution of higher education, as
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (d) and to the extent
 possible using available resources, each state agency that has
 1,500 or more employees shall post on the agency's intranet website
 or generally accessible Internet website an electronic form or link
 allowing an employee of the agency to submit suggestions and ideas
 on how to make the agency more cost-efficient.  The system for
 submitting suggestions and ideas must allow an employee to elect to
 submit a suggestion or idea that includes the employee's name or to
 submit an anonymous suggestion or idea.  If an employee elects to
 submit anonymously, the suggestion or idea may not be traceable to
 the employee and the system for anonymous submission may not record
 data linking the suggestion or idea to the computer used for the
 submission.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), each state agency
 that posts a form or link as provided by Subsection (b) shall post
 on the agency's generally accessible Internet website a link
 allowing members of the public to:
 (1)  monitor, in real time or on a weekly, monthly, or
 quarterly basis, submissions made under Subsection (b); and
 (2)  vote for the public's favorite submission.
 (d)  The department may exclude from the requirements of this
 section a state agency if the agency has a preexisting program or
 link that the department determines substantially meets the
 requirements of this section.
 (e)  The department shall adopt rules establishing
 procedures and required formats for implementing this section. The
 rules adopted under this subsection must require that submissions
 under Subsection (b) and votes under Subsection (c) be moderated to
 exclude overtly political or offensive material.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *