83R7454 AED-D By: Villarreal H.B. No. 1135 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of the Texas Native Seeds Committee. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Title 3, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding Chapter 50E to read as follows: CHAPTER 50E. TEXAS NATIVE SEEDS COMMITTEE Sec. 50E.001. PURPOSE. The purpose of the Texas Native Seeds Committee is to develop a 10-year master plan to increase: (1) the production of native seeds; and (2) the use of native seeds in restoration projects on public lands. Sec. 50E.002. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Committee" means the Texas Native Seeds Committee. (2) "Native seed" means a seed derived from a plant in a particular region or ecosystem native to this state not later than the 16th century. Sec. 50E.003. COMPOSITION. (a) The committee is composed of the following 12 members: (1) the commissioner of agriculture or the commissioner's designee; (2) the executive director of the Texas Department of Transportation or the executive director's designee; (3) one member of the public appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; (4) one member of the public appointed by the lieutenant governor; (5) two members of the public appointed by the governor; (6) one member from the Parks and Wildlife Department; (7) one member from the Texas Seed Trade Association; (8) the chair of the Senate Committee on Natural Resources; (9) the chair of the House Committee on Natural Resources; (10) one member representing an institution of higher education appointed by the other members of the committee; and (11) one member representing a conservation and education advocacy organization appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives. (b) The chair of the House Committee on Natural Resources serves as the presiding officer of the committee. Sec. 50E.004. MASTER PLAN. (a) The committee shall develop a 10-year master plan for the state: (1) to use native seeds in restoration projects on public lands; (2) to identify native plant seed sources that would easily adapt to diverse regions of the state; and (3) to ensure seed sources become commercially available at reasonable cost and in adequate supply. (b) The committee shall submit the master plan to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives not later than December 1, 2014. Sec. 50E.005. MEETINGS. (a) The committee shall meet at the call of the presiding officer and may hold additional meetings by telephone conference call if necessary. (b) Section 551.125, Government Code, applies to a meeting held by telephone conference call under this section, except that Subsection (b) of that section does not apply. (c) The chair of the Senate Committee on Natural Resources or the chair of the House Committee on Natural Resources may hold the meeting called by the presiding officer. Sec. 50E.006. PUBLIC HEARINGS. The committee shall hold at least three public hearings in locations that the committee chooses to afford interested persons an opportunity to appear and present views on any subject relating to the committee's powers and duties under this chapter. Sec. 50E.007. REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. A member of the committee may not receive compensation for service on the committee. Subject to availability of funds, a committee member may receive reimbursement for the actual and necessary expenses incurred while conducting committee business. Sec. 50E.008. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the committee is abolished December 2, 2014. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2013, the designated appointing officials shall appoint the members to the Texas Native Seeds Committee as provided by Sections 50E.003(a)(1)-(7) and (11), Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Texas Native Seeds Committee shall appoint a representative of an institution of higher education to serve on the committee as provided by Section 50E.003(a)(10), Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.