Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1160 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1160
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 9, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1160 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of a certificate of convenience and
 necessity in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 552, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 552.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.024.  TRANSFER OF CERTIFICATE OF CONVENIENCE AND
 NECESSITY IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies to a
 municipality that:
 (1)  has a population of not more than 2,500;
 (2)  is located in a county that:
 (A)  has a population of 1.7 million or more; and
 (B)  has two municipalities with a population of
 300,000 or more; and
 (3)  is served by a public utility that:
 (A)  provides service to the entire municipality;
 and
 (B)  charges rates for 5,000 gallons of water for
 residential customers that are at least 50 percent higher than the
 rates charged by a municipally owned utility that serves another
 part of the county in which the municipality is located.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, on application by a
 municipality described by Subsection (a), the agency with authority
 over certificates of convenience and necessity for water and sewer
 service shall transfer at such time and under such circumstances as
 specified by a trial court a certificate of convenience and
 necessity for water and sewer service from a public utility to the
 municipality for the public utility's service area located in the
 municipality's corporate limits, if the municipality:
 (1)  has instituted a condemnation proceeding under
 Chapter 21, Property Code, to acquire the property of the public
 utility's water and sewer system in the municipality's corporate
 limits; and
 (2)  will possess the financial, managerial, and
 technical capability to provide continuous and adequate water and
 sewer service to the area to the satisfaction of or in accordance
 with the orders of a trial court at the time of transfer.
 (c)  The transfer of the certificate shall not be effective
 unless:
 (1)  a judgment that transfers the real property of the
 public utility to the municipality becomes final and is not subject
 to further appeal; and
 (2)  the municipality has paid to the public utility
 the fair market value compensation due, as set by agreement or as
 ordered by a court judgment, for that taking of real property.
 (d)  This section does not expand, restrict, or otherwise
 alter the law with regard to a municipality's right to exercise the
 power of eminent domain under Chapter 21, Property Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 13.247(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If an area is within the boundaries of a municipality,
 all retail public utilities certified or entitled to certification
 under this chapter to provide service or operate facilities in that
 area may continue and extend service in its area of public
 convenience and necessity within the area pursuant to the rights
 granted by its certificate and this chapter, unless the
 municipality exercises its power of eminent domain to acquire the
 property of the retail public utility under Subsection (d).  Except
 as provided by Section 13.2475 or 13.255, a municipally owned or
 operated utility may not provide retail water and sewer utility
 service within the area certificated to another retail public
 utility without first having obtained from the commission a
 certificate of public convenience and necessity that includes the
 areas to be served.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter G, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.2475 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.2475.  CERTIFICATES OF PUBLIC CONVENIENCE AND
 NECESSITY TO PROVIDE SEWER SERVICE IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a)
 This section applies only to a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of more than 95,000;
 (2)  located in a county that:
 (A)  borders Lake Palestine; and
 (B)  has a population of more than 200,000;
 (3)  that owns and operates a utility that provides
 sewer service; and
 (4)  that has an area within the boundaries of the
 municipality that is certificated to another retail public utility
 that provides sewer service.
 (b)  A municipality may provide sewer service to an area
 entirely within the municipality's boundaries without first having
 to obtain from the commission a certificate of public convenience
 and necessity that includes the area to be served, regardless of
 whether the area to be served is certificated to another retail
 public utility.
 SECTION 4.  Section 552.024, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a condemnation proceeding in which the
 petition is filed on or after September 1, 2011. A condemnation
 proceeding in which the petition is filed before September 1, 2011,
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the petition was filed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *