Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1160 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1160


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of a certificate of convenience and
 necessity in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 552, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 552.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.024.  TRANSFER OF CERTIFICATE OF CONVENIENCE AND
 NECESSITY IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a)  This section applies to:
 (1)  a municipality that:
 (A)  has a population of not more than 2,500;
 (B)  is located in a county that:
 (i)  has a population of 1.7 million or more;
 and
 (ii)  has two municipalities with a
 population of 300,000 or more; and
 (C)  is served by a public utility that:
 (i)  provides service to the entire
 municipality; and
 (ii)  charges rates for 5,000 gallons of
 water for residential customers that are at least 50 percent higher
 than the rates charged by a municipally owned utility that serves
 another part of the county in which the municipality is located; and
 (2)  a municipality:
 (A)  with a population of more than 95,000;
 (B)  located in a county that:
 (i)  borders Lake Palestine; and
 (ii)  has a population of more than 200,000;
 (C)  that owns and operates a utility that
 provides sewer service; and
 (D)  that has an area within the boundaries of the
 municipality that is certificated to another retail public utility
 that provides sewer service.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, on application by a
 municipality described by Subsection (a), the agency with authority
 over certificates of convenience and necessity for water and sewer
 service shall transfer at such time and under such circumstances as
 specified by a trial court a certificate of convenience and
 necessity for water and sewer service from a public utility to the
 municipality for the public utility's service area located in the
 municipality's corporate limits, if the municipality:
 (1)  has instituted a condemnation proceeding under
 Chapter 21, Property Code, to acquire the property of the public
 utility's water and sewer system in the municipality's corporate
 limits; and
 (2)  will possess the financial, managerial, and
 technical capability to provide continuous and adequate water and
 sewer service to the area to the satisfaction of or in accordance
 with the orders of a trial court at the time of transfer.
 (c)  The transfer of the certificate shall not be effective
 unless:
 (1)  a judgment that transfers the real property of the
 public utility to the municipality becomes final and is not subject
 to further appeal; and
 (2)  the municipality has paid to the public utility
 the fair market value compensation due, as set by agreement or as
 ordered by a court judgment, for that taking of real property.
 (d)  This section does not expand, restrict, or otherwise
 alter the law with regard to a municipality's right to exercise the
 power of eminent domain under Chapter 21, Property Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.024, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a condemnation proceeding in which the
 petition is filed on or after September 1, 2011. A condemnation
 proceeding in which the petition is filed before September 1, 2011,
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the petition was filed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1160 was passed by the House on April
 24, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1160 on May 16, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1160 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 139,
 Nays 1, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1160 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1160 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor