Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1238 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1238
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 287 in
 Sherman and Dallam Counties as the Trooper Bobby Steve Booth
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.091.  TROOPER BOBBY STEVE BOOTH MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of U.S. Highway 287 between the northern corporate
 limits of the City of Stratford and the Texas-Oklahoma border is
 designated as the Trooper Bobby Steve Booth Memorial Highway. The
 designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Trooper Bobby Steve Booth Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *