Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1263 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            February 25, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the abolishment of the small claims courts.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, JP, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
February 25, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the abolishment of the small claims courts.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the abolishment of the small claims courts.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the abolishment of the small claims courts.), As Introduced

HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the abolishment of the small claims courts.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses. Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eighty-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date the Supreme Court must promulgate rules of civil procedure for small claims cases and the date small claims courts under Chapter 28, Government Code are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

LBB Staff: UP, CL, JP, KKR

 UP, CL, JP, KKR