Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1263 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 6, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eight-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date small claims courts are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013. The bill also specifies that certain rules to be adopted by the Texas Supreme Court by May 1, 2013, become effective on August 31, 2013. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses. Otherwise, the bill takes effect September 1, 2013.   Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, AM, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 6, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee On Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB1263 by Lewis (Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eight-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date small claims courts are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013. The bill also specifies that certain rules to be adopted by the Texas Supreme Court by May 1, 2013, become effective on August 31, 2013. The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses. Otherwise, the bill takes effect September 1, 2013.  

The bill would amend the provisions enacted by House Bill 79, Eight-second Legislature, First Called Session, relating to the abolishment of small claims courts. The bill would change the date small claims courts are abolished from May 1, 2013, to August 31, 2013. The bill also specifies that certain rules to be adopted by the Texas Supreme Court by May 1, 2013, become effective on August 31, 2013.

The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds in both houses. Otherwise, the bill takes effect September 1, 2013.  

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

LBB Staff: UP, CL, AM, KKR

 UP, CL, AM, KKR