Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1294 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1294
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1294 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dismissal of a charge for the offense of failing to
 secure a child in a child passenger safety seat system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 545.4121, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.4121.  DISMISSAL [DEFENSE]; OBTAINING [POSSESSION
 OF] CHILD PASSENGER SAFETY SEAT SYSTEM.
 SECTION 2.  Section 545.4121(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  It is a defense to prosecution of an offense to which
 this section applies that the defendant provides to the court
 evidence satisfactory to the court that:
 (1)  at the time of the offense:
 (A)  the defendant was not arrested or issued a
 citation for violation of any other offense;
 (B)  the defendant did not possess a child
 passenger safety seat system in the vehicle; and
 (C)  the vehicle the defendant was operating was
 not involved in an accident; and
 (2)  subsequent to the time of the offense, the
 defendant obtained [the defendant possesses] an appropriate child
 passenger safety seat system for each child required to be secured
 in a child passenger safety seat system under Section 545.412(a).
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *