Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1366 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 1366
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain procedures in family or juvenile law
 proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014(b), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An interlocutory appeal under Subsection (a), other
 than an appeal under Subsection (a)(4) or in a suit brought under
 the Family Code, stays the commencement of a trial in the trial
 court pending resolution of the appeal. An interlocutory appeal
 under Subsection (a)(3), (5), or (8) also stays all other
 proceedings in the trial court pending resolution of that appeal.
 SECTION 2.  Section 6.4035(c), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 132.001, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, the [The] waiver must be sworn before a notary public
 who is [but may] not [be sworn before] an attorney in the suit.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 201.015(a) and (e), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A party may request a de novo hearing before the
 referring court by filing with the clerk of the referring court a
 written request not later than the third [seventh] working day
 after the date the party receives notice of the substance of the
 associate judge's report as provided by Section 201.011.
 (e)  If a request for a de novo hearing before the referring
 court is filed by a party, any other party may file a request for a
 de novo hearing before the referring court not later than the third
 [seventh] working day after the date the initial request was filed.
 SECTION 4.  Section 201.1042(b), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The party requesting a de novo hearing before the
 referring court shall file notice with the clerk of the referring
 court not later than the third [seventh] working day after the date
 the associate judge signs the proposed order or judgment.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 201.317(a) and (d), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A party may request a de novo hearing before the
 referring court by filing with the clerk of the referring court a
 written request not later than the third [seventh] working day
 after the date the party receives notice of the substance of the
 associate judge's report as provided by Section 201.313.
 (d)  If a request for a de novo hearing before the referring
 court is filed by a party, any other party may file a request for a
 de novo hearing before the referring court not later than the third
 [seventh] working day after the date the initial request was filed.
 SECTION 6.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 51.014(b), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, applies only to an
 appeal of an interlocutory order rendered on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An appeal of an interlocutory order rendered
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before that date, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 6.4035(c), Family Code, applies to a waiver of service of process
 executed by a party to a suit for the dissolution of a marriage on or
 after the effective date of this Act, regardless of whether the suit
 is filed before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 8.  The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
 201, Family Code, apply only to a request for a de novo hearing in a
 case referred to an associate judge under Chapter 201, Family Code,
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A request for a de novo
 hearing in a case referred to an associate judge before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the case was referred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *