Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB139 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 139
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 10, 2013, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 139 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exercise of urban renewal powers by certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 374.902(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A county with a population of more than 250,000 and
 located along an international border or a county with a population
 of more than 1.3 million  may exercise the powers provided for
 municipalities under this chapter with respect to areas of the
 county that are not within the corporate boundaries of a
 municipality. A county with a population of more than 250,000 and
 located along an international border may exercise the powers
 provided for municipalities under this chapter with respect to
 areas of the county located within the corporate boundaries of a
 municipality, if the municipality approves the county's
 participation in an urban renewal project through an interlocal
 agreement under Chapter 791, Government Code. The county may not
 exercise those powers until the commissioners court of the county
 adopts a resolution in the manner provided by Section 374.011 for
 adoption of a resolution by a municipality. The resolution must be
 approved at an election held in the county in the manner provided
 for a municipal election under Section 374.011. The adoption of the
 resolution is not approved unless a majority of the voters who vote
 on the question in the entire county as well as in each municipality
 in the county approve the adoption of the resolution. In a
 municipality that is only partially located in the affected county,
 only voters who reside in the county may vote.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *