Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1394 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1394
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review of certain powers and duties
 performed by the Department of State Health Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.003.  SUNSET PROVISION.  (a) The Texas Board of
 Health and the Texas Department of Health were abolished by Section
 1.26, Chapter 198 (H.B. 2292), Acts of the 78th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2003, and the powers and duties of those entities
 under this chapter were transferred to other agencies, which are
 subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless
 the agencies to which those powers and duties are transferred are
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, this chapter
 expires September 1, 2015.
 (b)  In the review of the Department of State Health Services
 by the Sunset Advisory Commission, as required by this section and
 Section 1001.003, the sunset commission shall review the powers and
 duties exercised by the department under Chapter 108 and determine
 whether the department, under that chapter, is:
 (1)  achieving the legislature's intent of empowering
 consumers with information to make informed health care decisions;
 (2)  maintaining appropriate privacy and security
 standards for patient information; and
 (3)  limiting the patient information the department
 collects to the information necessary for performing the
 department's duties under Chapter 108.
 (c)  The Sunset Advisory Commission shall report its
 findings to the legislature in the report required by Section
 325.010, Government Code. This subsection and Subsection (b)
 expire September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 108, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 108.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.016.  SUNSET REVIEW. Unless continued in existence
 in accordance with Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act),
 after the review required by Section 11.003(b), this chapter
 expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *