Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1396 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 13, 2013      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1396 by King, Susan (Relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health Services.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) and the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to conduct a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics. The study must include certain information.   Not later than November 1, 2014, DFPS and DSHS are required to electronically submit a copy of the study prepared to certain parties.   The bill would expire September 1, 2015 and be effective September 1, 2013. DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. It is assumed that any costs associated with the bill can be absorbed by DSHS within existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 537 State Health Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, SJ, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 13, 2013





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1396 by King, Susan (Relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health Services.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1396 by King, Susan (Relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health Services.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1396 by King, Susan (Relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health Services.), As Engrossed

HB1396 by King, Susan (Relating to a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics prepared by the Department of Family and Protective Services and the Department of State Health Services.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) and the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to conduct a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics. The study must include certain information.   Not later than November 1, 2014, DFPS and DSHS are required to electronically submit a copy of the study prepared to certain parties.   The bill would expire September 1, 2015 and be effective September 1, 2013. DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. It is assumed that any costs associated with the bill can be absorbed by DSHS within existing resources.

The bill would require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) and the Department of State Health Services (DSHS) to conduct a study on alcohol and controlled substance statistics. The study must include certain information.

 

Not later than November 1, 2014, DFPS and DSHS are required to electronically submit a copy of the study prepared to certain parties.

 

The bill would expire September 1, 2015 and be effective September 1, 2013.

DFPS does not anticipate any significant fiscal impact as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. It is assumed that any costs associated with the bill can be absorbed by DSHS within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 537 State Health Services, Department of

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, SJ, VJC

 UP, CL, SJ, VJC