Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1445 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1445
 (Senate Sponsor - Duncan)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 3, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 3, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1445 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the distribution of certain civil penalties and civil
 restitution received by the attorney general.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Chief Justice Jack
 Pope Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 402.007, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 402.007.  PAYMENT TO TREASURY; ALLOCATION OF CERTAIN
 MONEY RECEIVED BY ATTORNEY GENERAL [PENALTIES].  (a)  The attorney
 general shall immediately pay into the state treasury money
 received for a debt, a [or] penalty, or restitution.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (d) [(c)], the comptroller shall
 credit to the judicial fund for programs approved by the supreme
 court that provide basic civil legal services to the indigent the
 net amount of:
 (1)  a civil penalty that is recovered in an action by
 the attorney general in any matter actionable under Subchapter E,
 Chapter 17, Business & Commerce Code, after deducting amounts
 allocated to or retained by the attorney general as authorized by
 law, unless:
 (A) [(1)]  another law requires that the penalty
 be credited to a different fund or account; or
 (B) [(2)]  the judgment awarding the penalty
 requires that the penalty be paid to another named recipient; and
 (2)  civil restitution recovered by the attorney
 general in an action brought by the attorney general arising from
 conduct that violates a consumer protection, public health, or
 general welfare law, if, on the hearing of an ex parte motion filed
 by the attorney general after the entry of a judgment awarding civil
 restitution, the court:
 (A)  determines that, based on the facts and
 circumstances of the case:
 (i)  it is impossible or impracticable to
 identify injured parties;
 (ii)  it is impossible or impracticable to
 determine the degree to which each claimant was injured and
 entitled to recover;
 (iii)  the cost of administering a claim
 procedure will disproportionately reduce the amount of restitution
 available for the payment of individual claims; or
 (iv)  the claims of all identifiable persons
 eligible to receive restitution have been paid without exhausting
 the funds available for restitution; and
 (B)  enters a judgment or order that the
 restitution be credited to the judicial fund for programs approved
 by the supreme court that provide basic civil legal services to the
 indigent.
 (c)  If a court enters a judgment or order that restitution
 be credited to the judicial fund, the attorney general shall notify
 the Legislative Budget Board and shall distribute that restitution
 in accordance with the court judgment or order.
 (d)  The total amount credited to the judicial fund for
 programs approved by the supreme court that provide basic civil
 legal services to the indigent under Subsection (b) may not exceed
 $50 [$10] million per state fiscal biennium.
 (e)  The provisions of this section do not limit the common
 law authority or other statutory authority of the attorney general
 to seek and obtain cy pres distribution from a court.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a civil penalty or civil restitution that is received by the
 attorney general on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *