Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB15 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R4298 JSC-D
 By: Kolkhorst H.B. No. 15


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to level of care designations for hospitals that provide
 neonatal and maternal services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 241, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. HOSPITAL LEVEL OF CARE DESIGNATIONS FOR NEONATAL AND
 MATERNAL CARE
 Sec. 241.181.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 Sec. 241.182.  LEVEL OF CARE DESIGNATIONS. (a) The
 executive commissioner shall assign level of care designations to
 each hospital based on the neonatal and maternal services provided
 at the hospital.
 (b)  A hospital may receive different level designations for
 neonatal and maternal care, respectively.
 Sec. 241.183.  RULES. (a) The executive commissioner shall
 adopt rules:
 (1)  establishing the levels of care for neonatal and
 maternal care to be assigned to hospitals;
 (2)  prescribing criteria for designating levels of
 neonatal and maternal care, respectively, including specifying the
 minimum requirements to qualify for each level designation;
 (3)  establishing a process for the assignment of
 levels of care to a hospital for neonatal and maternal care,
 respectively;
 (4)  dividing the state into neonatal and maternal care
 regions;
 (5)  establishing neonatal and maternal care regional
 advisory councils and prescribing processes for the councils; and
 (6)  detailing confidential reporting requirements.
 (b)  Each level of care designation must require the hospital
 to:
 (1)  actively participate in the appropriate neonatal
 and maternal care regional advisory council; and
 (2)  regularly submit outcome and other data to the
 department as required or requested.
 (c)  The criteria a hospital must achieve to receive each
 level of care designation must be posted on the department's
 Internet website.
 Sec. 241.184.  ASSIGNMENT OF LEVEL OF CARE DESIGNATION. (a)
 The executive commissioner in consultation with the department
 shall assign the appropriate level of care designation to each
 hospital that meets the minimum standards for that level of care.
 The executive commissioner shall evaluate separately the neonatal
 and maternal services provided at the hospital and assign the
 respective level of care designations accordingly.
 (b)  Biennially, the executive commissioner and the
 department shall review the levels of care designations assigned to
 each hospital and, as necessary, assign a hospital a different
 level of care designation or remove the hospital's level of care
 designation.
 Sec. 241.185.  HOSPITAL FAILING TO ACHIEVE MINIMUM LEVELS OF
 CARE. A hospital that does not meet the minimum requirements for
 any level of care designation for neonatal or maternal services:
 (1)  may not receive a level of care designation for
 those services; and
 (2)  is not eligible to receive reimbursement through
 the Medicaid program for neonatal or maternal services, as
 applicable.
 SECTION 2.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (3)  "Task force" means the Perinatal Facility
 Designation Implementation Task Force established under this
 section.
 (b)  The task force consists of 14 members appointed by the
 executive commissioner as follows:
 (1)  four neonatologists, at least two of whom must
 practice in a Level IIIC neonatal intensive care unit;
 (2)  one general pediatrician;
 (3)  two general obstetrician-gynecologists;
 (4)  two maternal fetal medicine specialists;
 (5)  one family practice physician who provides
 obstetrical care and practices in a rural community;
 (6)  one representative from a children's hospital;
 (7)  one representative from a hospital with a Level II
 neonatal intensive care unit;
 (8)  one representative from a rural hospital; and
 (9)  one representative from a general hospital.
 (c)  To the extent possible, the executive commissioner
 shall appoint members to the task force who previously served on the
 Neonatal Intensive Care Unit Council established under Chapter 818
 (H.B. 2636), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011.
 (d)  A member of the task force serves without compensation
 but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary travel
 expenses related to the performance of task force duties.
 (e)  The Health and Human Services Commission, the
 department, and the task force shall work together to develop a
 process for the designation of levels of neonatal and maternal care
 at hospitals in accordance with Subchapter H, Chapter 241, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (f)  The task force shall:
 (1)  develop criteria for designating levels of
 neonatal and maternal care, respectively, including specifying the
 minimum requirements to qualify for each level designation;
 (2)  develop a process for the assignment of levels of
 care to a hospital for neonatal and maternal care, respectively;
 (3)  make recommendations for the division of the state
 into neonatal and maternal care regions;
 (4)  develop processes for neonatal and maternal care
 regional advisory councils; and
 (5)  develop confidential reporting requirements.
 (g)  In developing the criteria for the levels of neonatal
 and maternal care, the task force shall consider:
 (1)  any recommendations or publications of the
 American Academy of Pediatrics and the American Congress of
 Obstetricians and Gynecologists, including the Guidelines for
 Perinatal Care; and
 (2)  the geographic and varied needs of citizens of
 this state.
 (h)  Each level of care designation must comply with Section
 241.183(b), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (i)  The task force shall submit a report detailing the task
 force's determinations and recommendations to the department and
 the executive commissioner not later than September 1, 2015.
 (j)  The task force is abolished August 31, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2013, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall appoint the members of the Perinatal Facility Designation
 Implementation Task Force as required by Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  Not later than March 1, 2016, after consideration of the
 report of the Perinatal Facility Designation Implementation Task
 Force, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall adopt the initial rules required by Section
 241.183, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than August 31, 2016, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 complete the neonatal and maternal level of care designation
 assignments for each hospital in this state.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 241.185, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a hospital is not required to have a
 level of care designation as a condition of reimbursement through
 the Medicaid program before September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.