Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1534 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1534


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of certain segments of highway in
 Collin County and Jim Wells County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 225.091 and 225.092 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 225.091.  SAM JOHNSON HIGHWAY. (a)  Notwithstanding
 Section 225.001(c), the portion of U.S. Highway 75 in Collin County
 between its intersection with the President George Bush Highway and
 its intersection with U.S. Highway 380 is designated as the Sam
 Johnson Highway.  The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sam Johnson Highway and any other appropriate
 information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 Sec. 225.092.  LT. GENERAL MARC CISNEROS HIGHWAY. (a)
 Notwithstanding Section 225.001(c), the portion of U.S. Highway 281
 in Jim Wells County between its intersection with Farm-to-Market
 Road 716 and its intersection with County Road 422 is designated as
 the Lt. General Marc Cisneros Highway.  The designation is in
 addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Lt. General Marc Cisneros Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1534 was passed by the House on April
 25, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1534 on May 17, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1534 on May 25, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1534 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 15, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1534 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor