Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB154 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor, Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 154
 (Senate Sponsor - West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the termination of the parent-child relationship and
 the duty to pay child support in circumstances involving mistaken
 paternity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 161.005(e) and (i), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  A petition under Subsection (c) must be filed not later
 than the second [first] anniversary of the date on which the
 petitioner becomes aware of the facts alleged in the petition
 indicating that the petitioner is not the child's genetic father.
 (i)  An order under Subsection (h) terminating the
 parent-child relationship ends the petitioner's obligation for
 future support of the child as of the date the order is rendered, as
 well as the obligation to pay interest that accrues after that date
 on the basis of a child support arrearage or money judgment for a
 child support arrearage existing on that date.  The order does not
 affect the petitioner's obligations for support of the child
 incurred before that date [or the petitioner's obligation to pay
 interest that accrues after that date on the basis of child support
 arrearages existing on that date].  Those obligations are
 enforceable until satisfied by any means available for the
 enforcement of child support other than contempt.
 SECTION 2.  Section 161.005, Family Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a suit affecting the parent-child relationship
 pending in a trial court on the effective date of this Act or filed
 on or after that date. A suit affecting the parent-child
 relationship in which a final order is rendered before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the order was rendered, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *