Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1545 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Allen, Riddle (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1545
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1545 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the use of certain public
 transportation services by persons with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this Act, "providers" and "services" have
 the meanings assigned by Section 461.009, Transportation Code.
 (b)  The Governor's Committee on People with Disabilities,
 in coordination with providers located in rural and urban areas of
 the state, and paratransit advocacy groups, shall conduct a study
 to determine:
 (1)  the feasibility of standardizing the process of
 certifying an individual's eligibility for services in the state;
 and
 (2)  whether the current 21-day provision of services
 by a provider is adequate to meet the needs of visitors with
 disabilities to locations served by the provider.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the Governor's Committee
 on People with Disabilities shall submit a report on the findings of
 the study performed under this section to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives that have
 jurisdiction over issues related to transportation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *