Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1605 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1605


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot program in Harris County to
 provide maternity care management to certain women enrolled in the
 Medicaid managed care program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0996 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0996.  PREGNANCY MEDICAL HOME PILOT PROGRAM. (a)
 The commission shall develop and implement a pilot program in
 Harris County to create pregnancy medical homes that provide
 coordinated evidence-based maternity care management to women who
 reside in the pilot program area and are recipients of medical
 assistance through a Medicaid managed care model or arrangement
 under Chapter 533.
 (b)  In developing the pilot program, the commission shall
 ensure that each pregnancy medical home created for the program
 provides a maternity management team that:
 (1)  consists of health care providers, including
 obstetricians, gynecologists, family physicians or primary care
 providers, physician assistants, certified nurse midwives,
 advanced practice registered nurses, and social workers, in a
 single location;
 (2)  conducts a risk-classification assessment for
 each pilot program participant on entry into the program to
 determine whether her pregnancy is considered high- or low-risk;
 (3)  based on the assessment under Subdivision (2),
 establishes an individual pregnancy care plan for each participant;
 and
 (4)  follows the participant throughout her pregnancy
 in order to reduce poor birth outcomes.
 (c)  The commission may incorporate financial incentives to
 health care providers who participate in a maternity management
 team as a component of the pilot program.
 (d)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the commission shall
 report to the legislature on the progress of the pilot program. The
 report must include:
 (1)  an evaluation of the pilot program's success in
 reducing poor birth outcomes; and
 (2)  a recommendation as to whether the pilot program
 should be continued, expanded, or terminated.
 (e)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules to implement
 this section.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1605 was passed by the House on April
 25, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 3, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1605 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 12,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1605 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor