Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1633 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 29, 2013      TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1633 by Dukes (Relating to creating an advisory committee to study child abuse and neglect fatalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would create the Protect our Kids Commission.  The appropriate appointing authority is required to appoint members to the commission not later than December 31, 2013. Not later than December 1, 2015, the commission is required to submit to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives a report containing findings and recommendations regarding the relationship between child protective services and child welfare services and the rate of child abuse and neglect fatalities. The bill would expire on December 13, 2015 and the Protect our Kids Commission would be abolished. It is assumed that the Office of the Governor and the Department of Family and Protective Services could absorb any costs associated with the bill within existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:301 Office of the Governor, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, SJ, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 29, 2013





  TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1633 by Dukes (Relating to creating an advisory committee to study child abuse and neglect fatalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1633 by Dukes (Relating to creating an advisory committee to study child abuse and neglect fatalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1633 by Dukes (Relating to creating an advisory committee to study child abuse and neglect fatalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB1633 by Dukes (Relating to creating an advisory committee to study child abuse and neglect fatalities.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would create the Protect our Kids Commission.  The appropriate appointing authority is required to appoint members to the commission not later than December 31, 2013. Not later than December 1, 2015, the commission is required to submit to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives a report containing findings and recommendations regarding the relationship between child protective services and child welfare services and the rate of child abuse and neglect fatalities. The bill would expire on December 13, 2015 and the Protect our Kids Commission would be abolished. It is assumed that the Office of the Governor and the Department of Family and Protective Services could absorb any costs associated with the bill within existing resources.

The bill would create the Protect our Kids Commission. 

The appropriate appointing authority is required to appoint members to the commission not later than December 31, 2013.

Not later than December 1, 2015, the commission is required to submit to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House of Representatives a report containing findings and recommendations regarding the relationship between child protective services and child welfare services and the rate of child abuse and neglect fatalities.

The bill would expire on December 13, 2015 and the Protect our Kids Commission would be abolished.

It is assumed that the Office of the Governor and the Department of Family and Protective Services could absorb any costs associated with the bill within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 301 Office of the Governor, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

301 Office of the Governor, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, CL, SJ, VJC

 UP, CL, SJ, VJC