83R16999 MCK-D By: Bonnen of Brazoria H.B. No. 1675 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1675: By: Harper-Brown C.S.H.B. No. 1675 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review process. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: ARTICLE 1. ENTITIES GIVEN 2015 SUNSET DATE SECTION 1.01. UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE. Section 33.083, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) The University Interscholastic League is subject to review under Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), but is not abolished under that chapter. The University Interscholastic League shall be reviewed during the period in which state agencies abolished in 2015 are reviewed. The University Interscholastic League shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset Advisory Commission in performing the review under this subsection. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the costs of the review performed under this subsection, and the University Interscholastic League shall pay the amount of those costs promptly on receipt of a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission regarding those costs. This subsection expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 1.02. CLEAR LAKE CITY WATER AUTHORITY. Chapter 101, Acts of the 58th Legislature, Regular Session, 1963, is amended by adding Section 1A to read as follows: Sec. 1A. (a) The Authority is subject to review under Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), as if it were a state agency but may not be abolished under that chapter. The review shall be conducted as if the Authority were scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2015. (b) The review must assess the Authority's governance, management, and operating structure and the Authority's compliance with legislative requirements. (c) The Authority shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset Advisory Commission in performing a review of the Authority under this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the costs, and the Authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the costs. (d) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 1.03. SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY. Chapter 3, Acts of the 69th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1985, is amended by adding Section 1A to read as follows: Sec. 1A. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. (a) The authority is subject to review under Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), as if it were a state agency but may not be abolished under that chapter. The review shall be conducted as if the authority were scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2015. (b) The review must assess the authority's governance, management, and operating structure and the authority's compliance with legislative requirements. (c) The authority shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset Advisory Commission in performing a review of the authority under this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the costs, and the authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the costs. (d) This section expires September 1, 2015. ARTICLE 2. ENTITIES GIVEN 2017 SUNSET DATE SECTION 2.01. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. Section 201.204, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 201.204. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Department of Transportation is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the department is abolished September 1, 2017 [2015]. ARTICLE 3. ENTITIES GIVEN 2019 SUNSET DATE SECTION 3.01. REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS. Section 8.010, Education Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 8.010. SUNSET PROVISION. Regional education service centers are subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the centers are abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2019 [2015]. SECTION 3.02. TEXAS STATE BOARD OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTANCY. Section 901.006, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 901.006. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas State Board of Public Accountancy is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2019 [2015]. ARTICLE 4. ENTITIES GIVEN 2021 SUNSET DATE SECTION 4.01. TEXAS INVASIVE SPECIES COORDINATING COMMITTEE. Section 776.007(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The committee is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). [The committee shall be reviewed during the periods in which the State Soil and Water Conservation Board is reviewed.] Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the committee is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021 [on the date on which that agency is subject to abolishment]. SECTION 4.02. TEXAS COUNCIL ON PURCHASING FROM PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. Section 122.006, Human Resources Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 122.006. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Council on Purchasing from People with Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021 [2015]. SECTION 4.03. DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION OF TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE. Section 31.004(b), Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Unless continued as provided by Chapter 325, Government Code, the duties of the division of workers' compensation of the Texas Department of Insurance under Title 5, Labor Code, expire September 1, 2021 [2017], or another date designated by the legislature. SECTION 4.04. OFFICE OF INJURED EMPLOYEE COUNSEL. Section 404.003, Labor Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 404.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The office of injured employee counsel is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the office is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021 [2017]. ARTICLE 5. ENTITIES REMOVED FROM SPECIFIC SUNSET REVIEW SECTION 5.01. EARLY CHILDHOOD HEALTH AND NUTRITION INTERAGENCY COUNCIL. Section 116.002, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 116.002. REVIEW BY [APPLICATION OF] SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION [ACT]. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall review the [The] Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council as part of its periodic review of the Department of Agriculture under [is subject to] Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). [Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2019.] ARTICLE 6. EFFECTIVE DATE SECTION 6.01. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.