Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1675 Comm Sub / Bill

                    83R16999 MCK-D
 By: Bonnen of Brazoria H.B. No. 1675
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1675:
 By:  Harper-Brown C.S.H.B. No. 1675


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review
 process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1. ENTITIES GIVEN 2015 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 1.01.  UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE.  Section
 33.083, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (e)  The University Interscholastic League is subject to
 review under Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), but
 is not abolished under that chapter.  The University
 Interscholastic League shall be reviewed during the period in which
 state agencies abolished in 2015 are reviewed.  The University
 Interscholastic League shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset
 Advisory Commission in performing the review under this subsection.
 The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the costs of the
 review performed under this subsection, and the University
 Interscholastic League shall pay the amount of those costs promptly
 on receipt of a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission
 regarding those costs.  This subsection expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 1.02.  CLEAR LAKE CITY WATER AUTHORITY. Chapter
 101, Acts of the 58th Legislature, Regular Session, 1963, is
 amended by adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  (a) The Authority is subject to review under
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), as if it were a
 state agency but may not be abolished under that chapter. The
 review shall be conducted as if the Authority were scheduled to be
 abolished September 1, 2015.
 (b)  The review must assess the Authority's governance,
 management, and operating structure and the Authority's compliance
 with legislative requirements.
 (c)  The Authority shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset
 Advisory Commission in performing a review of the Authority under
 this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the
 costs, and the Authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of
 a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the
 costs.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 1.03.  SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY. Chapter 3,
 Acts of the 69th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1985, is amended
 by adding Section 1A to read as follows:
 Sec. 1A.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. (a) The authority is
 subject to review under Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
 Act), as if it were a state agency but may not be abolished under
 that chapter. The review shall be conducted as if the authority
 were scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2015.
 (b)  The review must assess the authority's governance,
 management, and operating structure and the authority's compliance
 with legislative requirements.
 (c)  The authority shall pay the costs incurred by the Sunset
 Advisory Commission in performing a review of the authority under
 this section. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall determine the
 costs, and the authority shall pay the amount promptly on receipt of
 a statement from the Sunset Advisory Commission detailing the
 costs.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 ARTICLE 2. ENTITIES GIVEN 2017 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 2.01.  TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. Section
 201.204, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.204.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Department of
 Transportation is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
 Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the department is abolished September 1, 2017 [2015].
 ARTICLE 3. ENTITIES GIVEN 2019 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 3.01.  REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS. Section
 8.010, Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8.010.  SUNSET PROVISION.  Regional education service
 centers are subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
 Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
 the centers are abolished and this chapter expires September 1,
 2019 [2015].
 SECTION 3.02.  TEXAS STATE BOARD OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTANCY.
 Section 901.006, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 901.006.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas State
 Board of Public Accountancy is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the board is abolished and this chapter expires
 September 1, 2019 [2015].
 ARTICLE 4. ENTITIES GIVEN 2021 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 4.01.  TEXAS INVASIVE SPECIES COORDINATING
 COMMITTEE. Section 776.007(a), Government Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  The committee is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset
 Act).  [The committee shall be reviewed during the periods in which
 the State Soil and Water Conservation Board is reviewed.] Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the committee
 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021 [on the date
 on which that agency is subject to abolishment].
 SECTION 4.02.  TEXAS COUNCIL ON PURCHASING FROM PEOPLE WITH
 DISABILITIES. Section 122.006, Human Resources Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 122.006.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Council on
 Purchasing from People with Disabilities is subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the council is abolished and this
 chapter expires September 1, 2021 [2015].
 SECTION 4.03.  DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION OF TEXAS
 DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE. Section 31.004(b), Insurance Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Unless continued as provided by Chapter 325, Government
 Code, the duties of the division of workers' compensation of the
 Texas Department of Insurance under Title 5, Labor Code, expire
 September 1, 2021 [2017], or another date designated by the
 legislature.
 SECTION 4.04.  OFFICE OF INJURED EMPLOYEE COUNSEL. Section
 404.003, Labor Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 404.003.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The office of injured
 employee counsel is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the office is abolished and this chapter expires September
 1, 2021 [2017].
 ARTICLE 5. ENTITIES REMOVED FROM SPECIFIC SUNSET REVIEW
 SECTION 5.01.  EARLY CHILDHOOD HEALTH AND NUTRITION
 INTERAGENCY COUNCIL. Section 116.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 116.002.  REVIEW BY [APPLICATION OF] SUNSET ADVISORY
 COMMISSION [ACT]. The Sunset Advisory Commission shall review the
 [The] Early Childhood Health and Nutrition Interagency Council as
 part of its periodic review of the Department of Agriculture under
 [is subject to] Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).
 [Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
 council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2019.]
 ARTICLE 6. EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 6.01.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.