Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1717 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R3945 MAW-D
 By: Price H.B. No. 1717


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Board of
 Architectural Examiners; changing certain fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1051.003, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1051.003.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The Texas Board
 of Architectural Examiners is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the board is abolished and this subtitle expires
 September 1, 2025 [2013].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1051, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1051.3041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1051.3041.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR REGISTRATION. (a)  The board shall require that an
 applicant for a certificate of registration submit a complete and
 legible set of fingerprints, on a form prescribed by the board, to
 the board or to the Department of Public Safety for the purpose of
 obtaining criminal history record information from the Department
 of Public Safety and the Federal Bureau of Investigation.
 (b)  The board may not issue a certificate of registration to
 a person who does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
 (c)  The board shall conduct a criminal history check of each
 applicant for a certificate of registration using information:
 (1)  provided by the individual under this section; and
 (2)  made available to the board by the Department of
 Public Safety, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and any other
 criminal justice agency under Chapter 411, Government Code.
 (d)  The board may:
 (1)  enter into an agreement with the Department of
 Public Safety to administer a criminal history check required under
 this section; and
 (2)  authorize the Department of Public Safety to
 collect from each applicant the costs incurred by the Department of
 Public Safety in conducting the criminal history check.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1051.351, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a person who holds a
 certificate of registration issued under Chapter 1053 without
 examination may not renew the certificate on or after September 1,
 2016, unless, before September 1, 2016, the person has passed the
 registration examination adopted by the board under Section
 1053.154 and in effect on September 1, 2013. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 1051.353(b), (c), and (e), Occupations
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A person whose certificate of registration has been
 expired for 90 days or less may renew the certificate by paying to
 the board a renewal fee that is equal to 1-1/2 times the [normally]
 required renewal fee set by the board under Section 1051.651(b).
 (c)  A person whose certificate of registration has been
 expired for more than 90 days but less than two years may renew the
 certificate by paying to the board a renewal fee equal to two times
 the [normally] required renewal fee set by the board under Section
 1051.651(b).
 (e)  A person who was registered in this state, moved to
 another state, and is currently licensed or registered and has been
 in practice in the other state for the two years preceding the date
 of the application may obtain a new certificate of registration
 without reexamination. The person must pay to the board a fee that
 is equal to two times the [normally] required renewal fee set by the
 board under Section 1051.651(b) for the certificate of
 registration.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter G, Chapter 1051, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1051.3531 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1051.3531.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR RENEWAL. (a)  An applicant renewing a certificate
 of registration shall submit a complete and legible set of
 fingerprints for purposes of performing a criminal history check of
 the applicant as provided by Section 1051.3041.
 (b)  The board may not renew the certificate of registration
 of a person who does not comply with the requirement of Subsection
 (a).
 (c)  A holder of a certificate of registration is not
 required to submit fingerprints under this section for the renewal
 of the certificate of registration if the holder has previously
 submitted fingerprints under:
 (1)  Section 1051.3041 for the initial issuance of the
 certificate of registration; or
 (2)  this section as part of a prior renewal of a
 certificate of registration.
 SECTION 6.  Section 1051.452(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The amount of an administrative penalty may not exceed
 $5,000 for each violation. Each day a violation continues or occurs
 is a separate violation for purposes of imposing a penalty.
 SECTION 7.  Section 1051.652(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for the issuance of a certificate of
 registration under this chapter [to an applicant possessing a
 license or certificate to practice architecture in another state]
 and the fee for the renewal of a certificate of registration under
 this chapter are increased by $200.
 SECTION 8.  Section 1053.158, Occupations Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 9.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas
 Board of Architectural Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement the changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 1051,
 Occupations Code.
 (b)  Sections 1051.3041 and 1051.3531, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, and Sections 1051.353 and 1051.652, Occupations
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to an application for a
 certificate of registration or renewal of a certificate of
 registration filed with the Texas Board of Architectural Examiners
 on or after January 1, 2014. An application filed before that date
 is governed by the law in effect at the time the application was
 filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (c)  Section 1051.452(a), Occupations Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a violation of Subtitle B, Title 6,
 Occupations Code, committed on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A violation committed before that date is governed by the law
 in effect at the time the violation was committed, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.