Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1719 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Phillips H.B. No. 1719


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to passenger security screening and reporting by certain
 local government airport operators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended to
 read as follows: Sec. 23.002.  COMMISSIONING OF EMPLOYEES AS PEACE
 OFFICERS.  (a)  The governing body may commission an employee of an
 airport security force established under this chapter as a peace
 officer, subject to Subchapter C, Chapter 415, Government Code,
 Subchapter G, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, if the employee gives
 an oath and a bond for the faithful performance of the employee's
 duties as required by the governing body.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.004.  SCREENING PARTNERSHIP PROGRAM.  (a)  In this
 section, "airport operator" means:
 (1)  a local government that owns or controls an
 airport; or
 (2)  a person who operates, as the agent of a local
 government or otherwise, an airport owned or controlled by the
 local government.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2014, an airport operator
 shall apply to the Under Secretary of Transportation for Security
 under 49 U.S.C. Section 44920 to participate in the security
 screening opt-out program.
 (c)  The airport operator shall submit the following
 information to the Director of the Texas Department of Public
 Safety and the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation:
 (1)  not later than the 30th day after an application
 has been submitted under Subsection (b), a written statement that
 an application has been submitted;
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after receiving the
 notice, a copy of the notice of the disposition of the application;
 and
 (3)  not later than January 31, 2019, a written
 statement regarding any failure to receive a notice of the
 disposition of the application.
 (d)  an airport operator that fails to comply with subsection
 (b) may not receive state funding for the operation of the airport.
 (e)  This section expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.005.  PASSENGER COMPLAINT REPORT.  (a)  In this
 section, "airport operator" means:
 (1)  a local government that owns or controls an
 airport; or
 (2)  a person who operates, as the agent of a local
 government or otherwise, an airport owned or controlled by the
 local government.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2015 and on January 1 of each
 year thereafter, an airport operator shall submit the following
 information to the Director of the Texas Department of Public
 Safety and the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Transportation:
 (1)  a written report describing the number and nature
 of complaints received by the airport operator from passengers
 concerning the behavior of Transportation Security Administration
 agents.
 (c)  The written report submitted pursuant to Subsection (b)
 shall not include the identification of passengers or information
 that would compromise the privacy or security of passengers.
 (d)  This section expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 23, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.006  REPORT TO THE CONGRESSIONAL DELEGATION. Before
 the end of each even-numbered year, the director of the governor's
 Office of Homeland Security shall prepare and submit to the Texas
 Congressional delegation a report making recommendations regarding
 airport security screening.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.