H.B. No. 1741 AN ACT relating to requiring child safety alarms in certain vehicles used by child-care facilities to transport children. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code, is amended by adding Section 42.0424 to read as follows: Sec. 42.0424. CHILD SAFETY ALARMS IN VEHICLES. (a) In this section, "electronic child safety alarm" means an alarm system that prompts the driver of a vehicle to inspect the vehicle to determine whether children are in the vehicle before the driver exits the vehicle. (b) A licensed day-care center shall equip each vehicle owned or leased by the facility with an electronic child safety alarm if the vehicle is: (1) designed to seat eight or more persons; and (2) used to transport children under the care of the facility. (c) The licensed day-care center shall ensure that the electronic child safety alarm is properly maintained and used when transporting children. (d) The department shall adopt rules to implement this section. (e) This section applies only to a vehicle purchased or leased on or after December 31, 2013. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect December 31, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1741 was passed by the House on April 18, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 10, 2 present, not voting; that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1741 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 27, 2 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 215 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 1741 on May 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1741 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 8; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 215 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 1741 on May 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor