Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1843 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Branch (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1843
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limitations on the automatic admission of undergraduate
 students to general academic teaching institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.803(a-3) and (k), Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a-3)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a-1), The University of
 Texas at Austin may not offer admission under that subsection for an
 academic year after the 2017-2018 [2015-2016] academic year.
 (k)  A general academic teaching institution may not offer
 admission under Subsection (a-1) for an academic year after the
 2017-2018 academic year if, on the date of the institution's
 general deadline for applications for admission of first-time
 undergraduate students for that academic year:
 (1)  a final court order applicable to the institution
 prohibits the institution from considering an applicant's race or
 ethnicity as a factor in the institution's decisions relating to
 first-time undergraduate admissions; or
 (2)  the institution's governing board by rule, policy,
 or other manner has provided that an applicant's race or ethnicity
 may not be considered as a factor in the institution's decisions
 relating to first-time undergraduate admissions for that[, except
 that this subdivision does not apply to an institution that did not
 consider, on or before June 1, 2009, an applicant's race or
 ethnicity as a factor in its admissions of first-time resident
 undergraduate students for the 2009-2010] academic year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *