Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1847 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carter (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1847
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1847 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuing legal education in ethics or professional
 responsibility for prosecutors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 41, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.111 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.111.  TRAINING RELATED TO PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S
 DUTY TO DISCLOSE EXCULPATORY AND MITIGATING EVIDENCE.  (a)  Each
 attorney representing the state in the prosecution of felony and
 misdemeanor criminal offenses other than Class C misdemeanors shall
 complete a course of study relating to the duty of a prosecuting
 attorney to disclose exculpatory and mitigating evidence in a
 criminal case.
 (b)  The court of criminal appeals shall adopt rules relating
 to the training required by Subsection (a).  In adopting the rules,
 the court shall consult with a statewide association of prosecuting
 attorneys in the development, provision, and documentation of the
 required training.
 (c)  The rules must:
 (1)  require that each attorney, within 180 days of
 assuming duties as an attorney representing the state described in
 Subsection (a), shall receive one hour of instruction relating to
 the duty of a prosecuting attorney to disclose exculpatory and
 mitigating evidence in a criminal matter;
 (2)  require additional training on a schedule or at a
 time as determined by the court;
 (3)  provide that the required training be specific
 with respect to a prosecuting attorney's duties regarding the
 disclosure of exculpatory and mitigating evidence in a criminal
 case, and must be consistent with case law and the Texas
 Disciplinary Rules of Professional Conduct; and
 (4)  provide for a method of certifying the completion
 of the training described in Subdivisions (1) and (2).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The court of criminal appeals shall adopt
 rules required by Section 41.111, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, not later than January 1, 2014.
 (b)  A person who on January 1, 2014, is serving as an
 attorney representing the state as described in Section 41.111(a),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, must comply with the training
 requirements of this section not later than January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *