Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB195 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 195
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 195 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability on the Internet of reports of
 political expenditures and contributions filed in connection with
 certain county and municipal offices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 254.0401, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 254.0401.  AVAILABILITY OF [ELECTRONIC] REPORTS ON
 INTERNET.
 SECTION 2.  Section 254.0401, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) and amending Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  The county clerk of a county with a population of
 800,000 or more shall make a report filed with the clerk by a
 candidate, officeholder, or specific-purpose committee under this
 subchapter in connection with a county office or the office of
 county commissioner available to the public on the county's
 Internet website not later than the fifth business day after the
 date the report is received.
 (c)  The clerk of a municipality with a population of 500,000
 or more shall make a report filed with the clerk by a candidate,
 officeholder, or specific-purpose committee under this subchapter
 in connection with the office of mayor or member of the
 municipality's governing body available to the public on the
 municipality's Internet website not later than the fifth business
 day after the date the report is received.
 (f)  The commission shall clearly state on the Internet
 website on which reports are provided [under Subsection (b)] that
 reports filed by an independent candidate, a third-party candidate,
 or a specific-purpose committee for supporting or opposing an
 independent or third-party candidate will not be available if the
 candidate or committee has not yet filed a report.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Section 254.0401(b), Election Code, is
 repealed.
 (b)  Effective January 1, 2014, Section 176.009(b), Local
 Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  Section 254.0401, Election Code, as amended by
 this Act, and Section 176.009, Local Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, apply only to a report of political contributions and
 expenditures that is required to be filed under Chapter 254,
 Election Code, on or after January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 5.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *