H.B. No. 195 AN ACT relating to the availability on the Internet of reports of political expenditures and contributions filed in connection with certain county and municipal offices. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Section 254.0401, Election Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 254.0401. AVAILABILITY OF [ELECTRONIC] REPORTS ON INTERNET. SECTION 2. Section 254.0401, Election Code, is amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) and amending Subsection (f) to read as follows: (a-1) The county clerk of a county with a population of 800,000 or more shall make a report filed with the clerk by a candidate, officeholder, or specific-purpose committee under this subchapter in connection with a county office or the office of county commissioner available to the public on the county's Internet website not later than the fifth business day after the date the report is received. (c) The clerk of a municipality with a population of 500,000 or more shall make a report filed with the clerk by a candidate, officeholder, or specific-purpose committee under this subchapter in connection with the office of mayor or member of the municipality's governing body available to the public on the municipality's Internet website not later than the fifth business day after the date the report is received. (f) The commission shall clearly state on the Internet website on which reports are provided [under Subsection (b)] that reports filed by an independent candidate, a third-party candidate, or a specific-purpose committee for supporting or opposing an independent or third-party candidate will not be available if the candidate or committee has not yet filed a report. SECTION 3. (a) Section 254.0401(b), Election Code, is repealed. (b) Effective January 1, 2014, Section 176.009(b), Local Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 4. Section 254.0401, Election Code, as amended by this Act, and Section 176.009, Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to a report of political contributions and expenditures that is required to be filed under Chapter 254, Election Code, on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 5. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 195 was passed by the House on April 11, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 2, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 195 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 3 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 195 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor