Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1953 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 1953
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment for liquor by a retailer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.32, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A wholesale dealer who accepts a check or draft as
 payment from a retailer for the purchase of liquor must deposit the
 check or draft in the bank for payment or present the check or draft
 for payment within five business days after it is received.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *