H.B. No. 1971 AN ACT relating to a pilot program conducted by the Department of Aging and Disability Services to authorize certain accreditation surveys of assisted living facilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 247.033 to read as follows: Sec. 247.033. ACCREDITATION SURVEY PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The department may develop and implement a pilot program to authorize the use of an accreditation survey that complies with Section 247.032(b) to fulfill the requirements for a life and safety code survey or inspection or another survey or inspection required by this subchapter. If the department implements the pilot program, the department may implement the pilot program with the goal that not later than August 31, 2014, at least one assisted living facility will have used an accreditation survey for the purposes of this section. The accreditation commission's standards must meet or exceed the assisted living facility licensing requirements established by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission as required by Section 247.032(b)(1). (b) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1971 was passed by the House on May 2, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1971 was passed by the Senate on May 20, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor