Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2016 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2016
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the receipt or consideration of a petition requesting
 detachment and annexation by the board of trustees of a school
 district after adoption of consolidation resolutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 13, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 13.1521 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.1521.  RECEIPT OR CONSIDERATION OF PETITION
 REQUESTING DETACHMENT AND ANNEXATION AFTER ADOPTION OF
 CONSOLIDATION RESOLUTIONS.  If a resolution in favor of
 consolidation has been adopted by the board of trustees of each
 school district proposed to be consolidated into a particular
 single district, none of those boards of trustees may receive or
 consider a petition requesting detachment and annexation under
 Subchapter B without the consent of each of the other of those
 boards of trustees:
 (1)  before consolidation; or
 (2)  before consolidation is disapproved at an election
 under Section 13.153.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *