Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2028 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 2028
 (Senate Sponsor - Davis)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2028 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility requirements for plumbing licenses
 issued to applicants with military service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 1301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1301.3585 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1301.3585.  LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR
 APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a)  Notwithstanding any
 other law, the board shall credit verified military service,
 training, or education toward the licensing requirements, other
 than examination requirements, for a license issued under this
 chapter by the board.
 (b)  The board shall expedite the issuance of a provisional
 license or a license by endorsement or reciprocity under this
 chapter to an applicant who:
 (1)  has verified military experience; and
 (2)  holds a current license issued by another
 jurisdiction that has license requirements that are substantially
 equivalent to the license requirements of this state.
 (c)  The board shall adopt rules necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Section 1301.3585, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to an application for a license
 filed on or after May 1, 2014. An application for a license filed
 before May 1, 2014, is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 application was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 (b)  The Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners shall adopt
 rules under Section 1301.3585, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, not later than March 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *