H.B. No. 2029 AN ACT relating to the eligibility requirements for electrician licenses issued to applicants with military experience. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1305, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 1305.1645 to read as follows: Sec. 1305.1645. LICENSE ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR APPLICANTS WITH MILITARY EXPERIENCE. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, the department shall credit verified military service, training, or education toward the licensing requirements, other than examination requirements, for a license issued under this chapter by the department. (b) The department shall expedite the issuance of a temporary license or a license by endorsement or reciprocity under this chapter to an applicant who: (1) has verified military experience; and (2) holds a current license issued by another jurisdiction that has license requirements that are substantially equivalent to the license requirements of this state. (c) The commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement this section. SECTION 2. (a) Section 1305.1645, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies only to an application for a license filed on or after May 1, 2014. An application for a license filed before May 1, 2014, is governed by the law in effect on the date the application was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. (b) The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules under Section 1305.1645, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than March 1, 2014. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2029 was passed by the House on May 2, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2029 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2029 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor