Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2036 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R10463 CJC-D
 By: Branch H.B. No. 2036


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a commission to prepare for the
 celebration of the state's bicentennial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "commission" means the
 Texas 2036 Commission.
 SECTION 2.  COMMISSION. (a) The Texas 2036 Commission is
 created.
 (b)  The commission is composed of 12 members. The executive
 director of the Texas Historical Commission, the president general
 of the Daughters of the Republic of Texas, and the chair of the
 board of directors of the State Fair of Texas are members of the
 commission. The governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker
 of the house of representatives shall each appoint one member to the
 commission. The county judges of Bexar, Dallas, El Paso, Harris,
 Tarrant, and Travis Counties shall each appoint one member to the
 commission.
 (c)  Appointed members of the commission serve for two years
 and may be reappointed.
 (d)  Appointments to the commission shall be made without
 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
 national origin of the appointee.
 (e)  A vacancy in an appointed office of the commission shall
 be filled in the same manner as the original appointment.
 SECTION 3.  OFFICERS. The commission shall elect one of its
 members to serve as chair for a term of two years. The chair is
 entitled to vote on all matters before the commission.
 SECTION 4.  COMPENSATION.  A member of the commission serves
 without compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual
 and necessary expenses incurred in performing functions as a member
 of the commission, subject to any applicable limitation on
 reimbursement provided by the General Appropriations Act.
 SECTION 5.  MEETINGS. The commission shall meet at the call
 of the chair and as provided by commission rule.
 SECTION 6.  POWERS AND DUTIES OF COMMISSION. (a) The
 commission may adopt rules as necessary for its procedures.
 (b)  The commission shall plan and coordinate state and local
 activities related to the celebration of the state's bicentennial.
 (c)  The commission may encourage individuals, private
 organizations, and local governmental bodies to organize
 appropriate activities and may gather and disseminate information
 to the public relating to those activities.
 (d)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts and grants
 from any source to be used by the commission in performing its
 functions under this Act.
 SECTION 7.  COMMISSION REPORTS. (a) Before each regular
 session of the legislature, the commission shall report to the
 legislature on its activities during the preceding two-year period.
 The report must include an accounting, verified by a certified
 public accountant, of the money raised and spent by the commission
 during the period covered by the report.
 (b)  As soon after March 2, 2036, as the commission
 determines that it has completed its work and has satisfied its
 financial obligations, but not later than December 31, 2036, the
 commission shall file with the legislature and the secretary of
 state a final report verified by a certified public accountant that
 shows:
 (1)  the total amount of contributions received by the
 commission during the commission's existence;
 (2)  the total amount of expenditures made by the
 commission; and
 (3)  the total amount of money remaining in the
 commission's possession.
 (c)  On the date on which the commission files its final
 report, the commission shall deliver to the comptroller of public
 accounts all unexpended and unobligated money that the commission
 possesses. The comptroller shall deposit the money to the credit of
 the general revenue fund.
 SECTION 8.  EXPIRATION.  This Act expires and the commission
 is abolished January 1, 2037.
 SECTION 9.  INITIAL APPOINTMENTS.  The governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the appropriate county judges shall make the appointments
 required by Section 2 of this Act not later than November 1, 2013.
 SECTION 10.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.