H.B. No. 2036 AN ACT relating to the creation of a commission to identify future higher education and workforce needs of this state and make related recommendations to address those needs by the state's bicentennial. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 4, Government Code, is amended by adding Chapter 490F to read as follows: CHAPTER 490F. TEXAS 2036 COMMISSION Sec. 490F.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "commission" means the Texas 2036 Commission. Sec. 490F.002. CREATION OF COMMISSION; COMPOSITION. (a) The Texas 2036 Commission is created. (b) The commission is composed of the following members: (1) the presiding officer of the legislative standing committee in each house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over higher education; (2) the commissioner of higher education; (3) the chair of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board; (4) the chair of the Texas Workforce Commission; (5) the chair of a governing board of an institution of higher education appointed by the governor; (6) a trustee of a public junior college district appointed by the governor; (7) two persons appointed by the lieutenant governor, one of whom must possess experience in the field of education; and (8) two persons appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives, one of whom must possess experience in the field of education. (c) Appointed members of the commission serve for two years and may be reappointed. (d) Appointments to the commission shall be made without regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or national origin of the appointee. (e) A vacancy in an appointed office of the commission shall be filled in the same manner as the original appointment. Sec. 490F.003. OFFICERS. The members serving under Section 490F.002(b)(1) shall serve as presiding officers of the commission and are entitled to vote on all matters before the commission. Sec. 490F.004. COMPENSATION. A member of the commission serves without compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing functions as a member of the commission, subject to any applicable limitation on reimbursement provided by the General Appropriations Act. Sec. 490F.005. MEETINGS. The commission shall meet at the call of the presiding officers and as provided by commission rule. Sec. 490F.006. POWERS AND DUTIES OF COMMISSION. (a) The commission may adopt rules as necessary for its procedures. (b) The commission, with an emphasis on the changing demographics of this state, shall: (1) assess and identify future higher education and workforce needs in the state and the state's ability to meet those needs; and (2) develop recommendations for meeting those needs by the state's bicentennial in 2036, including recommendations for achieving the following goals by that date: (A) attaining a state workforce in which at least 60 percent of its workers hold a postsecondary credential, certificate, or degree of value in the workplace; (B) increasing by at least three the number of institutions of higher education designated as research institutions under the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board's accountability system; (C) ensuring the alignment of workforce development with higher education in this state; (D) increasing the college-attending population in this state to a level that is comparable to the best performing states on that measure; (E) improving the affordability of higher education in this state while maintaining excellence; and (F) ensuring the global competitiveness of the state workforce. Sec. 490F.007. REPORTS. Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the commission shall report to the legislature its assessment of the state's ability to meet the future higher education and workforce needs of this state and its recommendations for meeting those needs, including by achieving the goals prescribed by Section 490F.006(b)(2). Sec. 490F.008. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the commission is abolished January 1, 2037. SECTION 2. The governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives shall make the appointments required by Section 490F.002, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2013. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2036 was passed by the House on May 8, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2036 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2036 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor