Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2051 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Villalba, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2051
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of public institutions of higher
 education to make certain investments to support technology
 commercialization.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 153.006(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In order to carry out the purposes of this chapter and to
 support the activities of centers described in this chapter, to the
 extent authorized by its governing board, an institution of higher
 education may:
 (1)  enter into agreements establishing royalties,
 fees, and other consideration for technology developed in whole or
 part by the institution [it];
 (2)  accept equity interests in, convertible
 promissory debt instruments issued by, or a combination of equity
 interests in and convertible promissory debt instruments issued by
 organizations that license, manage, or otherwise administer rights
 to technology belonging to the institution [it] or under its
 control in exchange for such rights, in whole or in part;
 (3)  accept equity interests in, convertible
 promissory debt instruments issued by, or a combination of equity
 interests in and convertible promissory debt instruments issued by
 organizations that license or otherwise have rights in the
 institution's [its] technology as consideration for its providing
 monetary, business, scientific, or engineering services or
 technical assistance;
 (4)  use income from the commercialization of
 technology to fund the activities of the center;
 (5)  solicit, accept, and administer gifts, grants, and
 donations;
 (6)  enter into contracts for legal services with a
 competent lawyer or law firm to:
 (A)  prepare, file, pursue, and maintain patent
 applications in the United States or foreign jurisdictions;
 (B)  secure copyright protection for computer
 software;
 (C)  prepare, file, and pursue trademark and
 service mark applications;
 (D)  pursue litigation to prevent or stop
 infringement of any intellectual property rights of the
 institution; or
 (E)  handle any other legal matter related to the
 operation and activities of the center; and
 (7)  enter into such other business arrangements as may
 be appropriate for achieving the purposes of this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *